Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
New England Lift Truck Corp., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Gulfside Supply Inc., Fictitious Name Of Gulf Eagle Supply, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Filed Judgment Fully Satisfied | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
May 17, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Granted | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed Agreement For Payment | |
July 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings No Action By Court Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.