Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Fayerweather, Jeremiah, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Filed Judgment Fully Satisfied | |
January 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Hearing Passed Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Returned | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Requested | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.