Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Cronin, Michael, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Mary E. McCaffrey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Entered | |
January 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Charge Garnishee Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
January 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Charge Garnishee
Judge: McCaffrey, Mary E. |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | to Charge Garnishee | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.