Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Altieri, John, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 31, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Entered | |
March 15, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
March 15, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
June 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
March 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.