Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Justin, Carlos J, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Requested | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
January 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Alternative Service Hearing Concluded Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.