Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
T.D. Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Dumont, Jeanine M, against Preziuso, Paul A, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment No Action By Court Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | for Summary Judgment | |
May 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | of Reassignment Filed | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | for Summary Judgment | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.