Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Sivo, Derek, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Mary E. McCaffrey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
November 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Extension of Time At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: McCaffrey, Mary E. |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Sent | |
October 14, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Extension of Time Pending Judicial Review Judge: McCaffrey, Mary E. |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Filed | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | for Extension of Time for Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.