Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Walker, Branden, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Entered | |
January 05, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
January 05, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Requested | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
July 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.