Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
T.D. Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Dumont, Jeanine M, against Dahlbeck, Amy M, represented by Furtado, Michael J, Ruggiero, Daniel Goldsmith, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed with Prejudice | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
June 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment No Action By Court Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | for Summary Judgment | |
May 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | of Reassignment Filed | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | for Summary Judgment | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.