Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Fundings Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Hill, Victoria, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Christopher K. Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Entered | |
January 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
January 04, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
April 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Granted | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
July 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.