Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Aka Jana Flynn, Jana M. Devin, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed Judgment Fully Satisfied | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed Agreement For Payment | |
September 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Requested | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Contract Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.