Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lvnv Fundings Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Delmastro, Frank B, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
October 28, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
January 15, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Granted | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
May 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Canceled due to Covid-19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.