Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Fundings Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Garant, Patrick, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.