Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Romano, Mark T, against Aston, Cynthia A, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed | |
January 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Notice of Attachment Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.