Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Anesthesiology, Inc., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Patalano, Maryann, against Landry, Natashia M., represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with James J. Caruolo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2023 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Adjudge in Contempt
Judge: Caruolo, James J. |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Sent | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | to Adjudge in Contempt | |
November 29, 2022 | Hearing |
Show Cause Citation At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: Pirraglia (Retired), Robert K. |
|
October 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Adjudge in Contempt Hearing Continued Judge: Caruolo, James J. |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | to Show Cause Issued | |
October 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Adjudge in Contempt
Judge: Caruolo, James J. |
|
September 22, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Adjudge in Contempt Hearing Continued Judge: McCaffrey, Mary E. |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Sent | |
September 22, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Adjudge in Contempt
Judge: McCaffrey, Mary E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.