Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anesthesiology, Inc., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Patalano, Maryann, against Haynie, Jennifer L., represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed without Prejudice | |
October 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed Agreement For Payment | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Requested | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.