Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Romano, Mark T, against Wenmouth, Benjamin W, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
January 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Alternative Service Hearing Concluded Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Granted | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | for Alternative Service | |
December 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Alternative Service At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | for Alternative Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.