Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Amica Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Morrison, Amber K, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
December 10, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
March 11, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Objection Filed |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Filed | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
August 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.