Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Trombetti, David L, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissed | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment | |
September 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.