Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Dumont, Jeanine M, Kirkwood, Jennifer A., against Proulx, Paul R, represented by D'Ambra, Joanne C, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
June 13, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Judgment on Pleadings | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.