Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Kirkwood, Jennifer A., Hammer, Scott L., against Pimentel, Dani M, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
June 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
October 30, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.