Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Kirkwood, Jennifer A., Volpe, Richard J., against Mele, Amanda A, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
June 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
November 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.