Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Women&Infants Hospital Of Ri, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Morin, Ronald A, against A K A Natasha Zampini, Natasha Zito, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed with Prejudice | |
September 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing on Notice of Attachment Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | of Attachment Released | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Entered | |
February 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Entered | |
August 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.