Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Women&Infants Hospital Of Ri, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Morin, Ronald A, against Reyes, Marlin, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissed with Prejudice | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
April 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Notice of Attachment Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Entered | |
December 15, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Charge Garnishee Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | to Charge Garnishee | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.