Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Kirkwood, Jennifer A., Volpe, Richard J., against Hagopian, Arthur, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
June 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
November 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.