Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Kirkwood, Jennifer A., Dumont, Jeanine M, against Gallinari, Jonathan, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed Judgment Fully Satisfied | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment | |
July 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.