Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Perry-Mcstay Funeral Home, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Applebaum, Richard B., against Greene, Iii, Raymond A, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment | |
July 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
November 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Hearing Passed Judge: Clifton, William C. |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Filed | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.