Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Kirkwood, Jennifer A., Dumont, Jeanine M, against Carlson, Roger A, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
February 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
June 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
October 30, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.