Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Belknap, Douglas E, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Hearing Concluded Judge: Ovalles, Rafael A. |
|
November 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Answer Filed |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Entered | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Denied | |
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Filed | |
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.