Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Johnson, Robert E. Jr., against Sarkisian, Elizabeth L, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissed | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
November 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Extension of Time Hearing Concluded Judge: Ovalles, Rafael A. |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Entered | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Granted | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | for Extension of Time for Service | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.