Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Rhode Island, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Rhode Island Integrated Medicine, represented by Colantuono, Steven A, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with James J. Caruolo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissed with Prejudice | |
February 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Trial Hearing Concluded Judge: Caruolo, James J. |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Filed Agreement For Payment | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Entered | |
November 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Trial At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: Caruolo, James J. |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | of Reassignment Filed | |
October 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Trial At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: Caruolo, James J. |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | of Reassignment Filed | |
August 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Assign for Trial Hearing Continued Judge: Clifton, William C. |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.