Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Fournier, Jennifer Marie, Rousseau, Sean S., Hall, Joseph M, against Hughes, Jr, Edward, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.