Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hall, Joseph M, against Covington, Donna, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Issued as Ordered | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Requested | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.