Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hall, Joseph M, against Turcotte-Raposo, Tammy, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with James J. Caruolo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeBench Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | to Superior Court | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | of Appeal Filed | |
January 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Concluded Judge: Caruolo, James J. |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Entered | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | for Summary Judgment | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Filed | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.