Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Wallick, Marc D, against Fuller, Claudette M., represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Christine S. Jabour presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissed with Prejudice | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Entered | |
March 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Concluded Judge: Clifton, William C. |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Entered | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | of Reassignment Filed | |
January 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Continued Judge: Jabour, Christine S. |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Filed | |
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.