Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Wallick, Marc D, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismissed with Prejudice | |
October 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Notice of Attachment Granted Under Rule of Court Judge: Clifton, William C. |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Filed | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment | |
June 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Hearing Concluded Judge: Clifton, William C. |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Attachment Requested | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Attachment Issued As Ordered | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | of Reassignment Filed | |
April 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Hearing Continued Judge: Clifton, William C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.