Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
King Richard'S Auto Center, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Wallick, Marc D, against Rosen, Marc, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Requested | |
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Issued as Ordered | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | by Certified Mail Returned | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
October 27, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Extension of Time Hearing Concluded Judge: Clifton, William C. |
|
October 27, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Alternative Service Hearing Concluded Judge: Clifton, William C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.