Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Fournier, Jennifer Marie, Rousseau, Sean S., Garlick, James, against Kirinsky, William, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
July 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.