Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Johnson, Robert E. Jr., Laing, Lynda L., against Grist, Nathaniel, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
August 27, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
August 04, 2015 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: Ovalles, Rafael A. |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Requested | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
January 09, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Charge Garnishee Occurred |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.