Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Williamson, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Served | |
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Data Entry | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.