Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Wilkins, Joanne, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
December 03, 2013 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Occurred |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Attachment Requested | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Attachment Issued As Ordered | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned | |
August 15, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Occurred |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Under Rule of Court | |
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.