Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., Phipps, Jennifer Marie, against Randolph, Armund, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed without Prejudice | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | of Attachment Released | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed without Prejudice | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment | |
June 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
August 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.