Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Rockett, Dwight, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation File for Dismissal | |
September 24, 2013 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Passed |
|
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Passed | |
September 20, 2013 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Continued for Further Hearing |
|
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee | |
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event | of Non-Military Service | |
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.