Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Lowell, Tia, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissed without Prejudice | |
August 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Concluded Judge: Clifton, William C. |
|
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Entered | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Filed | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | for Summary Judgment | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.