Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Manickas Johnson, Beth, represented by Mcentee, Michael Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Passed |
|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Passed | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | of Bankruptcy Filed | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Applied | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Filed | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Filed | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Data Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.