Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Unifund Ccr Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Archambault, Keri, represented by Wright, Steven G, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Hearing Passed Judge: Clifton, William C. |
|
January 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Hearing Continued Judge: Clifton, William C. |
|
January 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Objection Filed |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Filed | |
January 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Charge Garnishee Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
December 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Notice of Attachment Hearing Concluded Judge: Clifton, William C. |
|
December 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Notice of Attachment Objection Filed |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Granted | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.