Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Moreau, Denise, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Objection Filed |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Filed | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
August 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Granted | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
November 09, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | of Reassignment Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.