Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hall, Joseph M, against Brown, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Issued as Ordered | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Filed | |
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event | of Non-Military Service | |
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event | And Default Entered | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Applied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.