Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Johnson, Robert E. Jr., Hall, Joseph M, against Scorpio, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Filed Judgment Fully Satisfied | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Issued as Ordered | |
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Filed | |
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Filed Agreement For Payment | |
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.