Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hall, Joseph M, against Pregoni, Maureen, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Occurred |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Under Rule of Court | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | of Non-Military Service | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | And Default Entered | |
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Applied | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Filed | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Data Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.